House | 05/07/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2724 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 574 | Journal Page: 2724 |
House | 05/02/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Postponed | 5/7/15 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2325 |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2325 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | RV#490 | Journal Page: 2245 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 602 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 602 | |
House | 02/17/2015 | Filed |