LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB1546
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB1546
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1546
Compare Versions
HB1546 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1546 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1546 Enrolled May 19, 2015
HB1546 Comm Sub May 11, 2015
HB1546 Engrossed April 15, 2015
HB1546 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB1546 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1546 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1546 Enrolled May 19, 2015
HB1546 Comm Sub May 11, 2015
HB1546 Engrossed April 15, 2015
HB1546 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare