Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1551 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Howard, Bonnen of Galveston, Koop H.B. No. 1551
 (Senate Sponsor - Hancock)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 13,
 Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to money distributed by the School Land Board to the
 available school fund or to the State Board of Education for
 investment in the permanent school fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.413, Natural Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.413.  TRANSFERS FROM THE REAL ESTATE SPECIAL FUND
 ACCOUNT TO THE AVAILABLE SCHOOL FUND AND THE PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND.
 (a) The board may, by a resolution adopted at a regular meeting,
 release from the real estate special fund account funds previously
 designated under Section 51.401 [of this chapter] or managed, used,
 or encumbered under Section 51.402 or Section 51.4021 [of this
 chapter] to be deposited in the State Treasury to the credit of:
 (1)  the available school fund; or
 (2)  the State Board of Education for investment in the
 permanent school fund.
 (b)  The board shall adopt rules to establish the procedure
 that will be used by the board to determine the date a transfer will
 be made and the amount of money that will be transferred to the
 available school fund or to the State Board of Education for
 investment in the permanent school fund from the real estate
 special fund account as provided by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter I, Chapter 51, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 51.4131 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.4131.  REPORT ON ANTICIPATED TRANSFER OF FUNDS. Not
 later than September 1 of each even-numbered year, the board shall
 submit to the legislature, comptroller, State Board of Education,
 and Legislative Budget Board a report that, specifically and in
 detail, states the date a transfer will be made and the amount of
 money the board will transfer during the subsequent state fiscal
 biennium from the real estate special fund account of the permanent
 school fund established under Section 51.401 to the available
 school fund or the State Board of Education for investment in the
 permanent school fund.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *