Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1560 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hernandez (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 1560
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HuffmanX
 EllisX
 BirdwellX
 CreightonX
 EstesX
 FraserX
 NelsonX
 SchwertnerX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to investment options for property recovered in a suit by a
 next friend or guardian ad litem on behalf of a minor or
 incapacitated person.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 142.004(a), Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  In a suit in which a minor or incapacitated person who
 has no legal guardian is represented by a next friend or an
 appointed guardian ad litem, any money recovered by the plaintiff,
 if not otherwise managed under this chapter, may be invested:
 (1)  by the next friend or guardian ad litem in:
 (A)  a higher education savings plan established
 under Subchapter G, Chapter 54, Education Code, or a prepaid
 tuition program [the Texas tomorrow fund] established under [by]
 Subchapter H [F], Chapter 54, Education Code; or
 (B)  interest-bearing time deposits in a
 financial institution doing business in this state and insured by
 the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation; or
 (2)  by the clerk of the court, on written order of the
 court of proper jurisdiction, in:
 (A)  a higher education savings plan established
 under Subchapter G, Chapter 54, Education Code, or a prepaid
 tuition program [the Texas tomorrow fund] established under [by]
 Subchapter H [F], Chapter 54, Education Code;
 (B)  interest-bearing deposits in a financial
 institution doing business in this state and insured by the Federal
 Deposit Insurance Corporation;
 (C)  United States treasury bills;
 (D)  an eligible interlocal investment pool that
 meets the requirements of Sections 2256.016, 2256.017, and
 2256.019, Government Code; or
 (E)  a no-load money market mutual fund, if the
 fund:
 (i)  is regulated by the Securities and
 Exchange Commission;
 (ii)  has a dollar weighted average stated
 maturity of 90 days or fewer; and
 (iii)  includes in its investment objectives
 the maintenance of a stable net asset value of $1 for each share.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *