E
|
06/03/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/03/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3137
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5366
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1698
|
Journal Page: 5366
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5366
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4972
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2430
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2430
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2430
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2430
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2430
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2430
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2430
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1297
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1297
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1130
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1954
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#376
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1909
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1908
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1908
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Clardy
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
House
|
02/18/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|