LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB1585
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB1585
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1585
Compare Versions
HB1585 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1585 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1585 Enrolled May 31, 2015
HB1585 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB1585 Engrossed May 17, 2015
HB1585 Comm Sub May 11, 2015
HB1585 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB1585 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1585 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1585 Enrolled May 31, 2015
HB1585 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB1585 Engrossed May 17, 2015
HB1585 Comm Sub May 11, 2015
HB1585 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare