House | 04/30/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2181 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 804 | Journal Page: 2180 |
House | 04/22/2015 | Postponed | 4/30/15 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 1816 |
House | 04/22/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1816 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1375 | |
House | 04/01/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 608 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 608 | |
House | 02/18/2015 | Filed |