LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB163
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB163
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB163
Compare Versions
HB163 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB163 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB163 Enrolled May 22, 2015
HB163 Comm Sub May 13, 2015
HB163 Engrossed April 16, 2015
HB163 Comm Sub March 31, 2015
HB163 Introduced November 10, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
HB163 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB163 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB163 Enrolled May 22, 2015
HB163 Comm Sub May 13, 2015
HB163 Engrossed April 16, 2015
HB163 Comm Sub March 31, 2015
HB163 Introduced November 10, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare