Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Returned from the House for further action
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Returned to the Senate for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 4936
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4979
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2419
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2419
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2419
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2419
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2419
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2419
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 2418
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2418
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2418
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2418
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1623
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1623
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1589
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3314
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1032
|
Journal Page: 3314
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3314
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3314
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3243
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3243
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Amended
|
2-Sheets
|
Journal Page: 3242
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3242
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 596
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 596
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|