E
|
06/20/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5466
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5466
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1718
|
Journal Page: 5466
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5466
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4982
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2614
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2614
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2614
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2614
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 2614
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2614
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Returned from the House for further action
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Returned to the Senate for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 4464
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4467
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2012
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2012
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2012
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2012
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2011
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2011
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 2011
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2011
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2011
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2011
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1462
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2863
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#779
|
Journal Page: 2863
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2863
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2863
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2740
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2740
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2740
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1944
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 596
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 596
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|