House | 05/13/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Returned to committee | Journal Page: 3254 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Point of order sustained | Rule 4, Section 18 | Journal Page: 3254 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3253 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Postponed | 5/12/15 7:15 PM | Journal Page: 3247 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 18 | Journal Page: 3215 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3215 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#975 | Journal Page: 3214 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Amendment tabled | 1-Dutton | Journal Page: 3214 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3200 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3200 | |
House | 05/09/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#686 | Journal Page: 2680 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1944 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 599 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 599 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Filed |