Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1670 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Sheets, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 1670
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 14, 2015;
3- May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
4- and Human Services; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the
5- following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 1670
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to the possession and removal of a placenta from a hospital
126 or birthing center.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. Subtitle H, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
159 amended by adding Chapter 172 to read as follows:
1610 CHAPTER 172. REMOVAL OF PLACENTA FROM HOSPITAL OR BIRTHING CENTER
1711 Sec. 172.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
1812 (1) "Birthing center" means a facility licensed under
1913 Chapter 244.
2014 (2) "Hospital" means a facility licensed under Chapter
2115 241 or a hospital maintained or operated by this state.
2216 Sec. 172.002. REMOVAL OF PLACENTA FROM HOSPITAL OR BIRTHING
2317 CENTER. (a) Except for the portion of a delivered placenta that is
2418 necessary for an examination described by Subsection (d), a
2519 hospital or birthing center without a court order shall allow a
2620 woman who has given birth in the facility, or a spouse of the woman
2721 if the woman is incapacitated or deceased, to take possession of and
2822 remove from the facility the placenta if:
2923 (1) the woman tests negative for infectious diseases
3024 as evidenced by the results of the diagnostic testing required by
3125 Section 81.090; and
3226 (2) the person taking possession of the placenta signs
3327 a form prescribed by the department acknowledging that:
3428 (A) the person has received from the hospital or
3529 birthing center educational information prescribed by the
3630 department concerning the spread of blood-borne diseases from
3731 placentas, the danger of ingesting formalin, and the proper
3832 handling of placentas; and
3933 (B) the placenta is for personal use.
4034 (b) A person removing a placenta from a hospital or birthing
4135 center under this section may only retain the placenta for personal
4236 use and may not sell the placenta.
4337 (c) A hospital or birthing center shall retain a signed form
4438 received under Subsection (a) with the woman's medical records.
4539 (d) This section does not prohibit a pathological
4640 examination of the delivered placenta that is ordered by a
4741 physician or required by a policy of the hospital or birthing
4842 center.
4943 (e) This section does not authorize a woman or the woman's
5044 spouse to interfere with a pathological examination of the
5145 delivered placenta that is ordered by a physician or required by a
5246 policy of the hospital or birthing center.
5347 (f) A hospital or birthing center that allows a person to
5448 take possession of and remove from the facility a delivered
5549 placenta in compliance with this section is not required to dispose
5650 of the placenta as medical waste.
5751 (g) A hospital or birthing center that acts in accordance
5852 with this section is not liable for the act in a civil action, a
5953 criminal prosecution, or an administrative proceeding.
6054 Sec. 172.003. DEPARTMENT DUTIES. The department shall
6155 develop the form and the educational information required under
6256 Section 172.002 and post a copy of the form and information on the
6357 department's Internet website.
6458 SECTION 2. (a) Not later than December 1, 2015, the
6559 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission
6660 shall adopt the rules necessary to implement Chapter 172, Health
6761 and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
6862 (b) Notwithstanding Section 172.002, Health and Safety
6963 Code, as added by this Act, a hospital or birthing facility is not
7064 required to comply with that section until January 1, 2016.
7165 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
7266 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
7367 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
7468 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
7569 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
76- * * * * *
70+ ______________________________ ______________________________
71+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
72+ I certify that H.B. No. 1670 was passed by the House on May
73+ 13, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, 2 present, not
74+ voting.
75+ ______________________________
76+ Chief Clerk of the House
77+ I certify that H.B. No. 1670 was passed by the Senate on May
78+ 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
79+ ______________________________
80+ Secretary of the Senate
81+ APPROVED: _____________________
82+ Date
83+ _____________________
84+ Governor