House | 04/17/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1644 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 203 | Journal Page: 1643 |
House | 04/16/2015 | Postponed | 4/17/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1610 |
House | 04/16/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1610 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Postponed | 4/16/15 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 1543 |
House | 04/14/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1543 | |
House | 04/08/2015 | Postponed | 4/14/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1401 |
House | 04/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1401 | |
House | 04/08/2015 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1063 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 599 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 599 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Filed |