House | 05/13/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1745 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 650 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 650 | |
House | 02/20/2015 | Filed |