Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1707 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Stephenson (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 1707
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the methods by which a political subdivision may submit
 contributions to the Texas Emergency Services Retirement System.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 865.014(c), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  Contributions required as provided by this section
 shall be paid at the times and in the manner that the state board
 prescribes by rule.  Contributions required by this section shall
 be submitted by electronic funds transfer, by wire transfer, or as
 an automated clearinghouse withdrawal (ACH debit) unless the
 executive director grants an exception based on the difficulty of a
 participating department's use of those [that] payment methods
 [method].  Contributions that are not paid within the time required
 by the state board accrue interest at the most recent assumed
 actuarial rate of return on investments of the fund.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *