LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB1709
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB1709
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1709
Compare Versions
HB1709 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1709 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1709 Enrolled May 23, 2015
HB1709 Comm Sub May 15, 2015
HB1709 Engrossed April 30, 2015
HB1709 Comm Sub April 21, 2015
HB1709 Introduced February 20, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB1709 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1709 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1709 Enrolled May 23, 2015
HB1709 Comm Sub May 15, 2015
HB1709 Engrossed April 30, 2015
HB1709 Comm Sub April 21, 2015
HB1709 Introduced February 20, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare