Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1717 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Oliveira (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 1717
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 April 28, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources and Economic Development; May 20, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 20, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy taxes by certain
 municipalities for ecological and space exploration-related
 tourism.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 351, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 351.1054 to read as follows:
 Sec. 351.1054.  ALLOCATION OF REVENUE FOR ECOLOGICAL TOURISM
 AND SPACECRAFT AND SPACEPORT ACTIVITIES BY CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES.
 (a)  In this section, "spacecraft" and "spaceport" have the
 meanings assigned by Section 507.001, Local Government Code.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter, an
 eligible barrier island coastal municipality may use revenue from
 the municipal hotel occupancy tax for:
 (1)  promotional and event expenses for an ecological
 tourism event, including an event for which the primary attraction
 is traveling to an area of natural or ecological interest for the
 purpose of observing and learning about wildlife and the area's
 natural environment, if:
 (A)  a majority of the event's participants are
 tourists; and
 (B)  the event substantially increases economic
 activity at hotels and motels within or in the vicinity of the
 municipality; and
 (2)  expenses directly related to:
 (A)  the acquisition of sites to observe
 spacecraft and spaceport activities; and
 (B)  the construction, improvement, enlarging,
 equipping, repairing, operation, and maintenance of facilities
 utilized by hotel guests to observe and learn about spacecraft and
 spaceport operations.
 (c)  A municipality may use for the purposes provided by
 Subsections (b)(1) and (2) not more than the greater of:
 (1)  15 percent of the hotel occupancy tax revenue
 collected by the municipality; or
 (2)  the amount of tax received by the municipality at
 the rate of one percent of the cost of a room.
 SECTION 2.  Section 351.1055(d), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter and
 except as provided by Subsection (e), an eligible barrier island
 coastal municipality shall use at least the amount of revenue
 derived from the application of the tax at a rate of seven percent
 of the cost of a room for the purposes authorized under Sections
 351.101(a)(1) and (3) and Sections 351.1054(b)(1) and (2). If an
 eligible barrier island coastal municipality uses hotel occupancy
 tax revenue for a purpose described by Section 351.1054(b)(2), the
 municipality may not reduce the amount of revenue that is used for
 purposes described by Section 351.101(a)(3) to an amount that is
 less than the average amount of revenue used by the municipality for
 purposes described by Section 351.101(a)(3) during the 36-month
 period that precedes the municipality's first use of revenue for a
 purpose described by Section 351.1054(b)(2).
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *