Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5297
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5297
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5297
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4979
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2419
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2419
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2419
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2419
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2419
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2419
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2419
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1462
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2841
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#758
|
Journal Page: 2841
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2841
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2841
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2827
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2827
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1435
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|