House | 05/05/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2514 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 655 | Journal Page: 2513 |
House | 04/29/2015 | Postponed | 5/5/15 9:45 AM | Journal Page: 2093 |
House | 04/29/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2093 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1784 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 652 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 652 | |
House | 02/20/2015 | Filed |