E
|
06/16/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4774
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4466
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4188
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4189
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1330
|
Journal Page: 4188
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4188
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3908
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1750
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1750
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1750
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1750
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1749
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1749
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Fraser
|
Journal Page: 1749
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1749
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1749
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1749
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1585
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1503
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1256
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#448
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2120
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2120
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2120
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 716
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 716
|
House
|
02/20/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|