Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1499
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1499
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1252
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2451
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2282
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#499
|
Journal Page: 2282
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2282
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2282
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2221
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Amended
|
1-R. Miller
|
Journal Page: 2220
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2220
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2015
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 275
|
House
|
02/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 275
|
House
|
11/10/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|