House | 05/18/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3787 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation | Journal Page: 693 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 693 | |
House | 02/23/2015 | Filed |