E
|
05/23/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
E
|
05/14/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3676
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1593
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3264
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1539
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1539
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1539
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1539
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1539
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1539
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1539
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1392
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 960
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1746
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1638
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#248
|
Journal Page: 1637
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1637
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1637
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1530
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 654
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 654
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|