Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1773 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/23/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R8245 MK-D
 By: González H.B. No. 1773


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a task force to examine the
 effectiveness of school counseling programs in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  TASK FORCE ON PUBLIC SCHOOL COUNSELING PROGRAMS.
 (a) A task force is established under this section to examine the
 effectiveness of school counseling programs on student performance
 in public schools.
 (b)  The task force is composed of the following 50 members
 appointed by the commissioner of education:
 (1)  20 school counselors;
 (2)  10 individuals who serve on the board of trustees
 of a school district;
 (3)  10 superintendents;
 (4)  four representatives of regional education
 service centers who have experience with school counseling;
 (5)  one representative of the State Board of
 Education;
 (6)  one representative of the Texas Education Agency;
 (7)  two representatives of professional counseling
 associations; and
 (8)  two representatives of research organizations
 that have conducted academic studies on school counseling.
 (c)  In making appointments to the task force, the
 commissioner of education must include members from the counties
 that comprise the Texas-Mexico border area.
 (d)  The commissioner of education shall appoint the members
 of the task force not later than December 1, 2015. The commissioner
 shall fill a vacancy in the task force by the appointment of another
 person with the same qualifications as the original appointee.
 (e)  The representative of the Texas Education Agency shall
 serve as the presiding officer of the task force.
 (f)  The presiding officer shall call the initial meeting of
 the task force on or before January 1, 2016. The task force shall
 meet at the times and places that the presiding officer determines
 are appropriate.
 (g)  Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the
 task force.
 SECTION 2.  DUTIES OF TASK FORCE. The task force shall:
 (1)  examine whether public schools are using school
 counseling programs, including the national framework developed by
 the American School Counselor Association;
 (2)  determine which school counseling programs
 schools prefer to use; and
 (3)  conduct a statistical analysis, incorporating
 information on student demographics, to determine the
 effectiveness of school counseling programs and the impact on
 student achievement and performance.
 SECTION 3.  REPORT. Not later than September 1, 2017, the
 task force shall deliver a report to the commissioner of education
 detailing the task force's findings and recommendations and the
 results of the statistical analysis conducted by the task force.
 SECTION 4.  EXPIRATION. The task force is abolished, and
 this Act expires, December 1, 2017.
 SECTION 5.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect September
 1, 2015.