Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1793 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Frullo, Dale (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 1793
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 WhitmireX
 HuffmanX
 BurtonX
 CreightonX
 HinojosaX
 MenéndezX
 PerryX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to reports of certain missing children and to the
 administration of missing or exploited children prevention grants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 63.009(a), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Local law enforcement agencies, on receiving a report of
 a missing child or a missing person, shall:
 (1)  if the subject of the report is a child and the
 [well-being of the] child is at a high risk of harm or is otherwise
 in danger or if the subject of the report is a person who is known by
 the agency to have or is reported to have chronic dementia,
 including Alzheimer's dementia, whether caused by illness, brain
 defect, or brain injury, immediately start an investigation in
 order to determine the present location of the child or person;
 (2)  if the subject of the report is a child or person
 other than a child or person described by Subdivision (1), start an
 investigation with due diligence in order to determine the present
 location of the child or person;
 (3)  immediately, but not later than two hours after
 receiving the report, enter the name of the child or person into the
 clearinghouse, the national crime information center missing
 person file if the child or person meets the center's criteria, and
 the Alzheimer's Association Safe Return crisis number, if
 applicable, with all available identifying features such as dental
 records, fingerprints, other physical characteristics, and a
 description of the clothing worn when last seen, and all available
 information describing any person reasonably believed to have taken
 or retained the missing child or missing person; and
 (4)  inform the person who filed the report of the
 missing child or missing person that the information will be
 entered into the clearinghouse, the national crime information
 center missing person file, and the Alzheimer's Association Safe
 Return crisis number, if applicable.
 SECTION 2.  Article 63.0091, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 63.0091.  LAW ENFORCEMENT REQUIREMENTS REGARDING
 REPORTS OF CERTAIN MISSING CHILDREN. (a)  The public safety
 director of the Department of Public Safety shall adopt rules
 regarding the procedures for a local law enforcement agency on
 receiving a report of a missing child who:
 (1)  had been reported missing on four or more
 occasions in the 24-month period preceding the date of the current
 report; [or]
 (2)  is in foster care or in the conservatorship of the
 Department of Family and Protective Services and had been reported
 missing on two or more occasions in the 24-month period preceding
 the date of the current report; or
 (3)  is under 14 years of age and otherwise determined
 by the local law enforcement agency or the Department of Public
 Safety to be at a high risk of human trafficking, sexual assault,
 exploitation, abuse, or neglectful supervision.
 (b)  The rules adopted under this article must require that
 in entering information regarding the report into the national
 crime information center missing person file as required by Article
 63.009(a)(3) for a missing child described by Subsection (a), the
 local law enforcement agency shall indicate, in the manner
 specified in the rules, that the child is at a high risk of harm
 [endangered] and include relevant information regarding any [the]
 prior occasions on which the child was reported missing.
 (c)  If, at the time the initial entry into the national
 crime information center missing person file is made, the local law
 enforcement agency has not determined that the requirements of this
 article apply to the report of the missing child, the information
 required by Subsection (b) must be added to the entry promptly after
 the agency investigating the report or the Department of Public
 Safety determines that the missing child is described by Subsection
 (a).
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter A, Chapter 63, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended by adding Article 63.0092 to read as follows:
 Art. 63.0092.  OPTION TO DESIGNATE MISSING CHILD AS HIGH
 RISK. (a) This article applies to a report of a missing child who is
 at least 14 years of age and who a local law enforcement agency or
 the Department of Public Safety determines is at a high risk of
 human trafficking, sexual assault, exploitation, abuse, or
 neglectful supervision.
 (b)  In entering information regarding a report described by
 Subsection (a) into the national crime information center missing
 person file as required by Article 63.009(a)(3), the local law
 enforcement agency may indicate that the child is at a high risk of
 harm and may include any other relevant information.
 SECTION 4.  Section 411.0133, Government Code, is
 transferred to Chapter 772, Government Code, redesignated as
 Section 772.0072, Government Code, and amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 772.0072  [411.0133].  MISSING OR EXPLOITED CHILDREN
 PREVENTION GRANTS. (a)  In this section, "nonprofit organization"
 means an organization exempt from federal income taxation under
 Section 501(a), Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as an organization
 described by Section 501(c)(3) of that code [has the meaning
 assigned by Section 403.351].
 (b)  This section applies to a nonprofit organization that is
 formed to offer programs and provide information to parents or
 other legal custodians, children, schools, public officials,
 organizations serving youths, nonprofit organizations, and the
 general public concerning child safety and Internet safety and the
 prevention of child abductions and child sexual exploitation.
 (c)  The criminal justice division established under Section
 772.006 [department] may award a grant to a nonprofit organization
 described by Subsection (b) that is operating in this state to
 provide programs and information described by that subsection to
 assist the Department of Public Safety [department] in the
 performance of its [the department's] duties related to missing or
 exploited children, including any duty related to the missing
 children and missing persons information clearinghouse under
 Chapter 63, Code of Criminal Procedure.
 [(d)     The department may adopt rules to implement this
 section.]
 SECTION 5.  Articles 63.009(a) and 63.0091, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, as amended by this Act, and Article 63.0092, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, as added by this Act, apply only to a missing
 child report that is received by a law enforcement agency on or
 after the effective date of this Act. A report that is received
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the report was received, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *