E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3642
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3621
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3621
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5860
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3567
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5693
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5693
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3400
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3399
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5498
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5498
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5498
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4981
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA1 Perry
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA6 L. Taylor
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Perry
|
Journal Page: 2624
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2624
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2624
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2658
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2404
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2088
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2088
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2088
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1550
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3148
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#927
|
Journal Page: 3147
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3147
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3147
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3035
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Amended
|
3-Farney
|
Journal Page: 3035
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 515
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 515
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|