LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB1841
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB1841
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1841
Compare Versions
HB1841 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1841 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1841 Enrolled May 28, 2015
HB1841 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB1841 Engrossed April 30, 2015
HB1841 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB1841 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1841 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1841 Enrolled May 28, 2015
HB1841 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB1841 Engrossed April 30, 2015
HB1841 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare