Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1846 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Taylor (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 1846
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to public comments on federal grants and contracts related
 to the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter K, Chapter 431, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 431.250 to read as follows:
 Sec. 431.250.  PUBLIC COMMENTS FOR FEDERAL GRANTS AND
 CONTRACTS. (a) The department shall annually solicit comments
 from interested persons regarding the grants and contracts the
 department has requested from or entered into with the United
 States Food and Drug Administration for implementing the federal
 Act and its amendments, including the Food Safety Modernization Act
 (21 U.S.C. Section 2201 et seq.).
 (b)  The department shall solicit comments by posting on the
 department's Internet website a detailed description of and
 providing notice to interested persons of each grant and contract
 described by Subsection (a) requested or entered into during the
 previous year. The description and notice must include the
 benefits to this state, the department, the regulated community,
 and the public.
 (c)  The department shall respond to questions and comments
 about a grant or contract described by Subsection (a) to the best of
 the department's knowledge. If an interested person requests that
 the department decline to receive future federal funding from the
 grant or contract, the department shall consider the request and
 determine whether the benefits of the grant or contract outweigh
 the person's concerns.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *