Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1855 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Rose (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 1855
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2015;
3- May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
4- Justice; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
5- Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 1855
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to training, continuing education, and weapons
126 proficiency standards for correctional officers employed by the
137 Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
148 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
159 SECTION 1. Chapter 493, Government Code, is amended by
1610 adding Sections 493.032, 493.033, and 493.034 to read as follows:
1711 Sec. 493.032. REQUIRED TRAINING FOR CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS.
1812 (a) The department shall require each correctional officer
1913 employed by the department to complete, during the correctional
2014 officer's first 24 months of service, not less than 280 hours of
2115 training, including:
2216 (1) 140 hours of on-the-job training; and
2317 (2) mental health crisis intervention training.
2418 (b) The department, in consultation with the Texas
2519 Commission on Law Enforcement, shall develop mental health crisis
2620 intervention training to be part of the training required by
2721 Subsection (a)(2).
2822 (c) The department by rule shall provide temporary
2923 exceptions to the requirements of this section for a correctional
3024 officer who cannot complete the training required by Subsection (a)
3125 due to:
3226 (1) a medical emergency involving the officer or a
3327 member of the officer's family;
3428 (2) the officer's active military service; or
3529 (3) the officer's unit or facility being unable to
3630 provide training in a timely manner due to severe weather or a
3731 catastrophic event.
3832 (d) An exception created by the department under Subsection
3933 (c) must ensure compliance with the training requirements of this
4034 section as soon as practicable after the period required by this
4135 section.
4236 (e) The department shall indicate in the correctional
4337 officer's personnel file that the officer has completed the
4438 training required by this section.
4539 (f) A correctional officer is not required to complete
4640 training under this section if the officer's personnel file
4741 indicates that the officer has completed the training required by
4842 this section during a previous period of employment as a
4943 correctional officer during the preceding 36 months.
5044 (g) The department may suspend or otherwise discipline a
5145 correctional officer who fails to comply with the requirements of
5246 this section.
5347 Sec. 493.033. CONTINUING EDUCATION REQUIRED FOR
5448 CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS. (a) The department shall require each
5549 correctional officer employed by the department to complete at
5650 least 80 hours of continuing education programs once every 24
5751 months. The department may suspend or otherwise discipline a
5852 correctional officer who fails to comply with this requirement.
5953 (b) As part of the continuing education requirement under
6054 Subsection (a), a correctional officer must complete a training and
6155 education program that covers the core requirements designated by
6256 the department.
6357 (c) The department shall develop specialized training for
6458 correctional officers that may be credited toward continuing
6559 education requirements.
6660 (d) The department by rule shall provide temporary
6761 exceptions to the continuing education requirements of this section
6862 for a correctional officer who cannot meet the continuing education
6963 requirements of this section due to:
7064 (1) a medical emergency involving the officer or a
7165 member of the officer's family;
7266 (2) the officer's active military service; or
7367 (3) the officer's unit or facility being unable to
7468 provide training in a timely manner due to severe weather or a
7569 catastrophic event.
7670 (e) An exception created by the department under Subsection
7771 (d) must ensure compliance with the continuing education
7872 requirements of this section as soon as practicable after the
7973 period required by this section.
8074 Sec. 493.034. CONTINUING DEMONSTRATION OF WEAPONS
8175 PROFICIENCY. (a) The department shall designate one or more
8276 firearms proficiency officers and require each correctional
8377 officer employed by the department to demonstrate weapons
8478 proficiency to a firearms proficiency officer at least annually.
8579 The department shall maintain records of the weapons proficiency of
8680 correctional officers.
8781 (b) The department by rule shall define weapons proficiency
8882 for purposes of this section.
8983 SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2016, the Texas
9084 Department of Criminal Justice shall adopt rules as required by
9185 Sections 493.032, 493.033, and 493.034, Government Code, as added
9286 by this Act.
9387 SECTION 3. (a) Section 493.032, Government Code, as added
9488 by this Act, applies only to a correctional officer hired by the
9589 Texas Department of Criminal Justice on or after the effective date
9690 of this Act. A correctional officer hired before the effective date
9791 of this Act is governed by the law in effect immediately before the
9892 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
9993 that purpose.
10094 (b) Sections 493.033 and 493.034, Government Code, as added
10195 by this Act, apply to a correctional officer employed by the Texas
10296 Department of Criminal Justice on or after the effective date of
10397 this Act, regardless of whether the officer is hired before, on, or
10498 after that date.
10599 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
106- * * * * *
100+ ______________________________ ______________________________
101+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
102+ I certify that H.B. No. 1855 was passed by the House on May 6,
103+ 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 125, Nays 17, 2 present, not
104+ voting.
105+ ______________________________
106+ Chief Clerk of the House
107+ I certify that H.B. No. 1855 was passed by the Senate on May
108+ 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
109+ ______________________________
110+ Secretary of the Senate
111+ APPROVED: _____________________
112+ Date
113+ _____________________
114+ Governor