House | 04/30/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 709 | Journal Page: 2224 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1745 | |
House | 04/07/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 627 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 627 | |
House | 02/24/2015 | Filed |