Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1868 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/24/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R2646 JSL-D
 By: Isaac H.B. No. 1868


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the essential knowledge and skills of the required
 public school curriculum and to certain state-adopted or
 state-developed assessment instruments for public school students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.023, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (a-11), (a-12), (a-13), and (a-14) to read as
 follows:
 (a-11)  Before an assessment instrument adopted or developed
 under Subsection (a) may be administered under that subsection, the
 assessment instrument must, on the basis of empirical evidence, be
 determined to be valid and reliable by an entity that is independent
 of the agency and of any other entity that developed the assessment
 instrument.
 (a-12)  The agency shall ensure that an assessment
 instrument adopted or developed under Subsection (a) is designed to
 primarily assess the essential knowledge and skills identified by
 the State Board of Education under Section 28.002 of the subject and
 for the grade level for which the assessment instrument is
 administered.  Only to the extent necessary or helpful for
 diagnostic or reporting purposes, the assessment instrument may
 also assess supporting knowledge or skills that are introduced or
 referenced in the subject and for the grade level for which the
 assessment instrument is administered but that are identified as
 essential knowledge or skills primarily of a different subject or
 for a different grade level.
 (a-13)  An assessment instrument adopted or developed under
 Subsection (a) must be designed so that:
 (1)  if administered to students in grades three
 through five, 85 percent of students will be able to complete the
 assessment instrument within 120 minutes; and
 (2)  if administered to students in grades six through
 eight, 85 percent of students will be able to complete the
 assessment instrument within 180 minutes.
 (a-14)  The amount of time allowed for administration of an
 assessment instrument adopted or developed under Subsection (a) may
 not exceed eight hours, and the administration may occur on only one
 day.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 39, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 39.0236 and 39.0237 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.0236.  STUDY OF ESSENTIAL KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS AND
 ASSESSMENT INSTRUMENTS. (a) The agency shall conduct a study
 regarding the essential knowledge and skills of the required
 curriculum identified by the State Board of Education under Section
 28.002 and assessment instruments administered under Section
 39.023.
 (b)  The study must evaluate:
 (1)  the number and scope of the essential knowledge
 and skills of each subject of the required curriculum under Section
 28.002, with each essential knowledge or skill identified as a
 readiness or supporting standard, and whether the number or scope
 should be limited;
 (2)  the number and subjects of assessment instruments
 under Section 39.023 that are required to be administered to
 students in grades three through eight; and
 (3)  how assessment instruments described by
 Subdivision (2) assess standards essential for student success and
 whether the assessment instruments should also assess supporting
 standards, including analysis of:
 (A)  the portion of the essential knowledge and
 skills capable of being accurately assessed;
 (B)  the appropriate skills that can be assessed
 within the testing parameters under current law; and
 (C)  how current standards compare to those
 parameters.
 (c)  Not later than March 1, 2016, the agency shall prepare
 and submit to the State Board of Education a report concerning the
 results of the study under Subsection (b).  Not later than May 1,
 2016, the State Board of Education shall review the study and shall
 submit to the governor, each member of the legislature, and the
 advisory committee established under Section 39.0237 the agency's
 report and board recommendations regarding each issue evaluated
 under Subsection (b).
 (d)  This section expires June 1, 2017.
 Sec. 39.0237.  ADVISORY COMMITTEE TO STUDY ESSENTIAL
 KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS AND ASSESSMENT INSTRUMENTS. (a)  An advisory
 committee shall be established to review the agency study and State
 Board of Education recommendations under Section 39.0236.  The
 committee must be composed of:
 (1)  four members of the senate standing committee with
 jurisdiction over public education appointed by the lieutenant
 governor and four members of the house standing committee with
 jurisdiction over public education appointed by the speaker of the
 house of representatives;
 (2)  two members of the public appointed by the
 lieutenant governor; and
 (3)  two members of the public appointed by the speaker
 of the house of representatives.
 (b)  The advisory committee shall review the agency study and
 State Board of Education recommendations under Section 39.0236.  If
 the advisory committee determines that the agency study is
 insufficient, the advisory committee may perform an additional
 independent study to evaluate the agency study components required
 under Section 39.0236(b).
 (c)  Not later than January 1, 2017, the committee shall
 prepare and submit to the governor, each member of the legislature,
 the commissioner, and the State Board of Education a report that
 includes, as applicable, the results of the committee's review of
 the agency study or the results of the committee's independent
 study and recommendations regarding each issue evaluated under
 Section 39.0236(b).
 (d)  Based on the study under Section 39.0236(b) and the
 advisory committee report under Subsection (c), the State Board of
 Education shall adopt policies and procedures to limit the number
 and scope of the essential knowledge and skills of each subject and
 grade level to correspond with the readiness standards capable of
 being accurately assessed by applicable assessment instruments.
 (e)  This section expires June 1, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter B, Chapter 39, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.0381 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.0381.  AUDITING AND MONITORING PERFORMANCE UNDER
 CONTRACTS FOR ASSESSMENT INSTRUMENTS. (a)  The agency by rule shall
 develop a comprehensive methodology for auditing and monitoring
 performance under contracts for services to develop or administer
 assessment instruments required by Section 39.023 to verify
 compliance with contractual obligations.
 (b)  The agency shall ensure that all new and renewed
 contracts described by Subsection (a) include a provision that the
 agency or a designee of the agency may conduct periodic contract
 compliance reviews, without advance notice, to monitor vendor
 performance.
 (c)  The agency shall adopt rules to administer this section.
 SECTION 4.  Section 39.053, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c-3) to read as follows:
 (c-3)  The indicator of student achievement under Subsection
 (c)(1) may not include student performance as to supporting
 knowledge or skills as described by Section 39.023(a-12).
 SECTION 5.  This Act applies beginning with the 2015-2016
 school year.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.