Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1874 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zerwas, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 1874
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 20, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of the Palliative Care
 Interdisciplinary Advisory Council.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The legislature finds that:
 (1)  palliative care is person-centered,
 family-focused care that provides a patient with relief from the
 symptoms, pain, and stress of a serious illness;
 (2)  palliative care is provided by a team of
 physicians, nurses, and other health care specialists to ensure an
 additional layer of support to a patient during the treatment of a
 serious illness;
 (3)  palliative care is appropriate for a patient of
 any age and at any stage of a serious illness; and
 (4)  evidence shows that palliative care can reduce
 medical costs in addition to helping a patient recover from a
 serious illness more quickly and easily.
 SECTION 2.  Subtitle E, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 118 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 118. PALLIATIVE CARE INTERDISCIPLINARY ADVISORY COUNCIL
 Sec. 118.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "advisory
 council" means the Palliative Care Interdisciplinary Advisory
 Council established under this chapter.
 Sec. 118.002.  ESTABLISHMENT; PURPOSE. The commission shall
 establish the Palliative Care Interdisciplinary Advisory Council
 to assess the availability of patient-centered and family-focused
 palliative care in this state.
 Sec. 118.003.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT.  The advisory
 council is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset
 Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter,
 the advisory council is abolished and this chapter expires
 September 1, 2019.
 Sec. 118.004.  MEMBERS. (a) The advisory council is
 composed of the members appointed by the executive commissioner as
 provided by this section.
 (b)  The advisory council must include:
 (1)  at least five physician members, including two who
 are board certified in hospice and palliative care and one who is
 board certified in pain management;
 (2)  three palliative care practitioner members,
 including two advanced practice registered nurses who are board
 certified in hospice and palliative care and one physician
 assistant who has experience providing palliative care;
 (3)  four health care professional members, including a
 nurse, a social worker, a pharmacist, and a spiritual care
 professional, with:
 (A)  experience providing palliative care to
 pediatric, youth, or adult populations;
 (B)  expertise in palliative care delivery in an
 inpatient, outpatient, or community setting; or
 (C)  expertise in interdisciplinary palliative
 care;
 (4)  at least three members with experience as an
 advocate for patients and the patients' family caregivers and who
 are independent of a hospital or other health care facility,
 including at least one member who is a representative of an
 established patient advocacy organization; and
 (5)  ex officio representatives of the commission or
 another state agency as the executive commissioner determines
 appropriate.
 (c)  Advisory council members serve at the pleasure of the
 executive commissioner.
 Sec. 118.005.  TERMS; VACANCY. (a)  An advisory council
 member serves a four-year term.
 (b)  If a vacancy occurs on the advisory council, a person
 shall be appointed to fill the vacancy for the unexpired term.
 Sec. 118.006.  OFFICERS. Advisory council members shall:
 (1)  elect a chair and a vice chair; and
 (2)  establish the duties of the chair and the vice
 chair.
 Sec. 118.007.  MEETINGS. The executive commissioner shall
 set a time and place for regular meetings, which must occur at least
 twice each year.
 Sec. 118.008.  COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT. A member of
 the advisory council may not receive compensation for service on
 the advisory council but is entitled to reimbursement of the travel
 expenses incurred by the member while conducting the business of
 the advisory council, as provided by the General Appropriations
 Act.
 Sec. 118.009.  DUTIES. The advisory council shall consult
 with and advise the commission on matters related to the
 establishment, maintenance, operation, and outcome evaluation of
 the palliative care consumer and professional information and
 education program established under Section 118.011.
 Sec. 118.010.  REPORT. Not later than October 1 of each
 even-numbered year, the advisory council shall submit a biennial
 report to the standing committees of the senate and the house of
 representatives with primary jurisdiction over health matters on:
 (1)  the advisory council's assessment of the
 availability of palliative care in this state for patients in the
 early stages of serious disease;
 (2)  the advisory council's analysis of barriers to
 greater access to palliative care; and
 (3)  the advisory council's analysis of the policies,
 practices, and protocols in this state concerning patients' rights
 related to palliative care, including:
 (A)  whether a palliative care team member may
 introduce palliative care options to a patient without the consent
 of the patient's attending physician;
 (B)  the practices and protocols for discussions
 between a palliative care team member and a patient on
 life-sustaining treatment or advance directives decisions; and
 (C)  the practices and protocols on informed
 consent and disclosure requirements for palliative care services.
 Sec. 118.011.  INFORMATION AND EDUCATION PROGRAM. (a)  The
 commission, in consultation with the advisory council, shall
 establish a statewide palliative care consumer and professional
 information and education program to ensure that comprehensive and
 accurate information and education about palliative care are
 available to the public, health care providers, and health care
 facilities.
 (b)  The commission shall make available on its Internet
 website information and resources regarding palliative care,
 including:
 (1)  links to external resources regarding palliative
 care;
 (2)  continuing education opportunities for health
 care providers;
 (3)  information about palliative care delivery in the
 home, primary, secondary, and tertiary environments; and
 (4)  consumer educational materials regarding
 palliative care, including hospice care.
 Sec. 118.012.  PROTECTIONS. Notwithstanding any other law,
 the advisory council and the information and education program
 established under this chapter do not create a cause of action or
 create a standard of care, obligation, or duty that provides a basis
 for a cause of action.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2015, the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall establish the Palliative Care
 Interdisciplinary Advisory Council and the executive commissioner
 of the Health and Human Services Commission shall appoint the
 advisory council members as required by Chapter 118, Health and
 Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *