Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1881 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Capriglione, et al. H.B. No. 1881
 (Senate Sponsor - Creighton)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 28, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 19, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 19, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing certain private schools to charge fees for
 processing or handling certain payments or payment transactions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle C, Title 5, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 111 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 111. PRIVATE SCHOOLS
 Sec. 111.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Cardholder" means the person named on the face of
 a credit or debit card to whom or for whose benefit the card is
 issued.
 (2)  "Credit card" means a card or device issued under
 an agreement by which the issuer gives to a cardholder the right to
 obtain credit from the issuer or another person.
 (3)  "Debit card" has the meaning assigned by Section
 502.001.
 (4)  "Private school" means a school that:
 (A)  offers a course of instruction for students
 in one or more grades from prekindergarten through grade 12;
 (B)  is not operated by a governmental entity; and
 (C)  is accredited by an accrediting agency that
 is a member of the Texas Private School Accreditation Commission.
 Sec. 111.002.  CHARGES AND FEES FOR CERTAIN PAYMENTS AT
 PRIVATE SCHOOLS. (a) This section applies to a payment of tuition,
 a fee, or another charge to a private school that is made or
 authorized in person, by mail, by telephone call, or through the
 Internet by means of:
 (1)  a credit card;
 (2)  a debit card; or
 (3)  an electronic funds transfer.
 (b)  A private school may charge a fee or other amount in
 connection with a payment to which this section applies, in
 addition to the amount of the tuition, fee, or other charge being
 paid, including:
 (1)  a discount, convenience, or service charge for the
 transaction; or
 (2)  a service charge in connection with a payment
 transaction that is dishonored or refused for lack of funds or
 insufficient funds.
 (c)  A fee or other charge under this section must be in an
 amount reasonable and necessary to reimburse the school for the
 expense incurred by the school in processing and handling the
 payment or payment transaction.
 (d)  Before accepting a payment by credit card, debit card,
 or electronic funds transfer, the school shall notify the
 cardholder or other person making the payment of any fee to be
 charged under this section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 59.402(b), Finance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  This section does not apply to:
 (1)  a state agency, county, local governmental entity,
 or other governmental entity that accepts a debit or stored value
 card for the payment of fees, taxes, or other charges; or
 (2)  a private school that accepts a debit card for the
 payment of fees or other charges, as provided by Section 111.002,
 Business & Commerce Code.
 SECTION 3.  Section 339.001(b), Finance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  This section does not apply to:
 (1)  a state agency, county, local governmental entity,
 or other governmental entity that accepts a credit card for the
 payment of fees, taxes, or other charges; or
 (2)  a private school that accepts a credit card for the
 payment of fees or other charges, as provided by Section 111.002,
 Business & Commerce Code.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *