E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2852
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5058
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5059
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1630
|
Journal Page: 5059
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5058
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4767
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2325
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2325
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2325
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2325
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2325
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2325
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2325
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1944
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1298
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1298
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1197
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2268
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#437
|
Journal Page: 2080
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2080
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2080
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2057
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Muoz
|
Journal Page: 2057
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2057
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1706
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 628
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 628
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|