House | 05/14/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3518 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Record vote | RV#1096 | Journal Page: 3518 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 3518 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3518 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amended | 2-Farias | Journal Page: 3517 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3517 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Postponed | 5/14/15 10:00 PM | Journal Page: 3513 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3469 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2451 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 629 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 629 | |
House | 02/25/2015 | Filed |