Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1899 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/25/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Schaefer H.B. No. 1899


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an award for certain members of the state military
 forces who served in defense support to a civilian authority
 mission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 431.134, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 431.134.  OTHER AWARDS. The adjutant general may adopt
 rules and regulations relating to the:
 (1)  Texas Faithful Service Medal, which shall be
 awarded to a member of the state military forces who has completed
 five years of honorable service during which the person has shown
 fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to the
 state;
 (2)  Federal Service Medal, which shall be awarded to a
 person who was inducted into federal service from the state
 military forces between June 15, 1940, and January 1, 1946, or after
 June 1, 1950, if the service was for more than 90 days;
 (3)  Texas Medal of Merit, which may be presented to a
 member of the military forces of this state, another state, or the
 United States who performs outstanding service or attains
 extraordinary achievement in behalf of the state or United States;
 (4)  Texas Outstanding Service Medal, which may be
 presented to a member of the military forces of this state, another
 state, or the United States who has performed service in a superior
 and clearly outstanding manner;
 (5)  Texas State Guard Service Medal, which shall be
 awarded to a person who completes three consecutive years of
 honorable service in the Texas State Guard during which the person
 has shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to
 the state;
 (6)  Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign Medal,
 which shall be awarded to a person who was inducted into federal
 service from the Texas National Guard after August 1, 1990, in
 support of Operation Desert Shield or Operation Desert Storm,
 without regard to the place that the person was deployed while
 serving on active federal military duty;
 (7)  Texas Humanitarian Service Medal, which shall be
 awarded to a person who:
 (A)  does not meet the criteria for an award of the
 federal Humanitarian Service Medal;
 (B)  is a member of the state military forces; and
 (C)  while serving under state active duty orders,
 participates satisfactorily in the accomplishment of missions to
 protect life or property during or soon after a natural disaster or
 civil unrest;
 (8)  Texas Cavalry Medal, which shall be awarded to a
 person who:
 (A)  served on or after September 11, 2001, in the
 124th Cavalry, Texas Army National Guard; and
 (B)  served in a hostile fire zone as designated
 by the United States secretary of defense;
 (9)  Texas Combat Service Ribbon, which shall be
 awarded to a member of the Texas National Guard who served, after
 September 11, 2001, in a hostile fire zone as designated by the
 United States secretary of defense;
 (10)  Texas Purple Heart Medal, which shall be awarded
 to a person who, after September 11, 2001:
 (A)  was inducted into federal service from the
 Texas National Guard; and
 (B)  meets the criteria for an award of the
 federal Purple Heart Medal; and
 (11)  Texas Homeland Defense Service Medal, which shall
 be awarded to a member of the state military forces who served:
 (A)  on or after September 11, 2001;
 (B)  on state active duty or active duty under
 state authority in accordance with Title 32 of the United States
 Code; and
 (C)  satisfactorily in defense support to a
 mission in the state under civilian authority; and
 (12)  Texas Border Security and Support Service Ribbon,
 which shall be awarded to any person who:
 (A)  served, on or after July 28, 2014, in the
 Texas National Guard or Texas State Guard; and
 (B)  while serving under state active duty orders,
 participates satisfactorily in support of operations to secure the
 Southwest Texas Border.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.