House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Returned from the Senate for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 5696
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts recall resolution
|
HCR 142
|
Journal Page: 3509
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House adopts resolution recalling from Senate
|
HCR 142
|
Journal Page: 5559
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Returned from the House for further action
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Returned to the Senate for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 4936
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1980
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1980
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1980
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1980
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1979
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1979
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Fraser
|
Journal Page: 1979
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1979
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1977
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1977
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 960
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1746
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#251
|
Journal Page: 1640
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1640
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1640
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1530
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|