LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB1927
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB1927
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1927
Compare Versions
HB1927 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1927 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1927 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB1927 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB1927 Engrossed May 4, 2015
HB1927 Comm Sub April 24, 2015
HB1927 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB1927 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1927 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1927 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB1927 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB1927 Engrossed May 4, 2015
HB1927 Comm Sub April 24, 2015
HB1927 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare