E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4847
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4847
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1576
|
Journal Page: 4847
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4847
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4572
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1976
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1976
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1976
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1976
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1976
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1975
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1975
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1944
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1257
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2344
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2164
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#462
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2100
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2100
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2100
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 631
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 631
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|