Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB193 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 84R437 TJB-D
22 By: Murphy H.B. No. 193
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to the phaseout and repeal of the franchise tax; lowering
88 the rates of the tax.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. (a) Effective January 1, 2016, Sections
1111 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows:
1212 (a) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as
1313 provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.75
1414 [one] percent of taxable margin.
1515 (b) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of
1616 the franchise tax is 0.38 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those
1717 taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade.
1818 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
1919 or after January 1, 2016.
2020 SECTION 2. (a) Effective January 1, 2017, Sections
2121 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows:
2222 (a) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as
2323 provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.50
2424 [one] percent of taxable margin.
2525 (b) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of
2626 the franchise tax is 0.25 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those
2727 taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade.
2828 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
2929 or after January 1, 2017.
3030 SECTION 3. (a) Effective January 1, 2018, Sections
3131 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows:
3232 (a) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as
3333 provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.25
3434 [one] percent of taxable margin.
3535 (b) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of
3636 the franchise tax is 0.13 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those
3737 taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade.
3838 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
3939 or after January 1, 2018.
4040 SECTION 4. (a) Effective January 1, 2016, Section
4141 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows:
4242 (b) The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that
4343 elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is
4444 computed by:
4545 (1) determining the taxable entity's total revenue
4646 from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011;
4747 (2) apportioning the amount computed under
4848 Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to
4949 determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and
5050 (3) multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision
5151 (2) by the rate of 0.43 [0.575] percent.
5252 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
5353 or after January 1, 2016.
5454 SECTION 5. (a) Effective January 1, 2017, Section
5555 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows:
5656 (b) The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that
5757 elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is
5858 computed by:
5959 (1) determining the taxable entity's total revenue
6060 from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011;
6161 (2) apportioning the amount computed under
6262 Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to
6363 determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and
6464 (3) multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision
6565 (2) by the rate of 0.29 [0.575] percent.
6666 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
6767 or after January 1, 2017.
6868 SECTION 6. (a) Effective January 1, 2018, Section
6969 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows:
7070 (b) The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that
7171 elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is
7272 computed by:
7373 (1) determining the taxable entity's total revenue
7474 from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011;
7575 (2) apportioning the amount computed under
7676 Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to
7777 determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and
7878 (3) multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision
7979 (2) by the rate of 0.14 [0.575] percent.
8080 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
8181 or after January 1, 2018.
8282 SECTION 7. (a) Chapter 171, Tax Code, is repealed.
8383 (b) A taxable entity that is subject to the franchise tax
8484 imposed under Chapter 171, Tax Code, on December 31, 2018, shall
8585 file a final franchise tax return and pay a transitional tax as
8686 required by this subsection on or before May 15, 2019. The
8787 transitional tax is equal to the tax the taxable entity would have
8888 paid in 2019 under Chapter 171, Tax Code, if Chapter 171, Tax Code,
8989 had not been repealed. The provisions of Chapter 171, Tax Code,
9090 relating to the computation and payment of the franchise tax remain
9191 in effect after the repeal of Chapter 171, Tax Code, by this section
9292 for the purposes of computing and paying the transitional tax
9393 required by this subsection.
9494 (c) Chapter 171, Tax Code, and Subtitle B, Title 2, Tax
9595 Code, continue to apply to audits, deficiencies, redeterminations,
9696 and refunds of any tax due or collected under Chapter 171, including
9797 the tax due as provided by Subsection (b) of this section, until
9898 barred by limitations.
9999 (d) The repeal of Chapter 171, Tax Code, does not affect:
100100 (1) the status of a taxable entity that has had its
101101 corporate privileges, certificate of authority, certificate of
102102 organization, certificate of limited partnership, corporate
103103 charter, or registration revoked, suit filed against it, or a
104104 receiver appointed under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter;
105105 (2) the ability of the comptroller, secretary of
106106 state, or attorney general to take action against a taxable entity
107107 under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter for actions that took
108108 place before the repeal; or
109109 (3) the right of a taxable entity to contest a
110110 forfeiture, revocation, lawsuit, or appointment of a receiver under
111111 Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter.
112112 (e) This section takes effect January 1, 2019.
113113 SECTION 8. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
114114 Act applies only to a report originally due on or after the
115115 effective date of this Act.
116116 SECTION 9. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
117117 Act takes effect January 1, 2016.