House | 05/12/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3191 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 678 | Journal Page: 3190 |
House | 05/05/2015 | Postponed | 5/12/15 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 2518 |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2518 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1746 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1373 | |
House | 03/19/2015 | Referred directly to s/c on Long-term Infrastructure Planning by chair | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 657 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 657 | |
House | 02/25/2015 | Filed |