E
|
05/28/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3898
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3754
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1184
|
Journal Page: 3755
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3754
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3263
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Zaffirini
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1392
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 930
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1558
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#218
|
Journal Page: 1557
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1557
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1557
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1543
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1543
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 657
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 657
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|