Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1953 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bonnen of Brazoria (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 1953
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NelsonX
 HinojosaX
 BettencourtX
 EltifeX
 HancockX
 HuffmanX
 KolkhorstX
 NicholsX
 SchwertnerX
 SeligerX
 Taylorof GalvestonX
 UrestiX
 WatsonX
 WestX
 WhitmireX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the deadline for counties and municipalities to provide
 notice of a proposed property tax rate.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 140.010(f), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (f)  A county or municipality shall:
 (1)  provide the notice required by Subsection (d) or
 (e), as applicable, not later than the later of September 1 or the
 30th day after the first date that the taxing unit has received each
 applicable certified appraisal roll by:
 (A)  publishing the notice in a newspaper having
 general circulation in:
 (i)  the county, in the case of notice
 published by a county; or
 (ii)  the county in which the municipality
 is located or primarily located, in the case of notice published by
 a municipality; or
 (B)  mailing the notice to each property owner in:
 (i)  the county, in the case of notice
 provided by a county; or
 (ii)  the municipality, in the case of
 notice provided by a municipality; and
 (2)  post the notice on the Internet website of the
 county or municipality, if applicable, beginning not later than the
 later of September 1 or the 30th day after the first date that the
 taxing unit has received each applicable certified appraisal roll
 and continuing until the county or municipality adopts a tax rate.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to an ad valorem tax year
 that begins on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016.
 * * * * *