LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB1964
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB1964
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1964
Compare Versions
HB1964 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1964 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1964 Enrolled May 19, 2015
HB1964 Comm Sub May 11, 2015
HB1964 Engrossed April 23, 2015
HB1964 Comm Sub April 14, 2015
HB1964 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB1964 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1964 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1964 Enrolled May 19, 2015
HB1964 Comm Sub May 11, 2015
HB1964 Engrossed April 23, 2015
HB1964 Comm Sub April 14, 2015
HB1964 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare