House | 05/07/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2792 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 458 | Journal Page: 2792 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 2792 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2757 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#737 | Journal Page: 2756 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2267 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 694 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 694 | |
House | 02/26/2015 | Filed |