E
|
06/20/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/20/2015
|
Signed by the Governor/line item veto
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
06/03/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Comptroller
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in Senate-Art III Sec 49a Tx. Const.
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2851
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5124
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
Journal Page: 5125
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1640
|
Journal Page: 5124
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5124
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4808
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Hinojosa
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2307
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2307
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 674
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
Journal Page: 1353
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#163
|
Journal Page: 1353
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1353
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1353
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1352
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1351
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Amended
|
8-R. Miller
|
Journal Page: 1351
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1351
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
7-Howard
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
5-Muoz
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1347
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#93
|
Journal Page: 1024
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 1024
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 625
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 625
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|