Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2002 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Keffer (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 2002
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 11, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 11, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the recycling of county surplus or salvage property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 263.152, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  Disposal under Subsection (a)(3) may be accomplished
 through a recycling program under which the property is collected,
 separated, or processed and returned to use in the form of raw
 materials in the production of new products.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *