E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6046
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3615
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5742
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1769
|
Journal Page: 5742
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5741
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6021
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3502
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3502
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3420
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5567
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5567
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3134
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3133
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2853
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2853
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2853
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4995
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4995
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4995
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4767
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2325
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2325
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2325
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2325
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2325
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2325
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2325
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1158
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1158
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1099
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#341
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1838
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1838
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 633
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 633
|
House
|
02/27/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|