Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2019 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2015

                    By: Craddick (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 2019
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 April 28, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources and Economic Development; May 21, 2015, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2019 By:  Seliger


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 FraserX
 EstesX
 BirdwellX
 HallX
 HancockX
 HinojosaX
 LucioX
 NicholsX
 SeligerX
 UrestiX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain counties to impose a hotel
 occupancy tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 352.002, Tax Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a-1) and adding Subsection (n) to read as
 follows:
 (a-1)  In addition to the counties described by Subsection
 (a), the commissioners court of a county in which an airport
 essential to the economy of the county is located may by the
 adoption of an order or resolution impose a tax on a person who,
 under a lease, concession, permit, right of access, license,
 contract, or agreement, pays for the use or possession or for the
 right to the use or possession of a room that is in a hotel, costs $2
 or more each day, and is ordinarily used for sleeping.  For the
 purposes of this subsection, an airport is considered to be
 essential to the economy of a county only if the airport is a
 commercial-service international airport within Class C airspace
 and is located in a county and owned by a municipality each having a
 population of less than 150,000 [125,000].  This subsection does
 not apply to a county described by Subsection (a)(13).
 (n)  The commissioners court of a county with a population of
 more than 300,000 and in which there is located all or part of the
 most populous military installation in this state may impose a tax
 as provided by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  Section 352.003, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (p) to read as follows:
 (p)  In a county authorized to impose the tax under Section
 352.002(n), the county tax rate in relation to a hotel located in a
 municipality that imposes a tax under Chapter 351 may not exceed a
 rate that, when added to the rate of the tax imposed by the
 municipality under Chapter 351, exceeds the sum of the rate
 prescribed by Section 351.003(a) plus two percent.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *