Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2020 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Martinez, Springer, Guillen H.B. No. 2020
 (Senate Sponsor - Campbell)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 18, 2015;
 May 19, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 24, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 24, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HancockX
 UrestiX
 CampbellX
 EltifeX
 HuffinesX
 SchwertnerX
 WestX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the scope of duties of an emergency medical
 technician-paramedic and a licensed paramedic.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 773, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 773.0496 to read as follows:
 Sec. 773.0496.  SCOPE OF EMERGENCY MEDICAL
 TECHNICIAN-PARAMEDIC AND LICENSED PARAMEDIC DUTIES. (a)  In this
 section:
 (1)  "Advanced life support" means health care provided
 to sustain life in an emergency, life-threatening situation. The
 term includes the initiation of intravenous therapy, endotracheal
 or esophageal intubation, electrical cardiac defibrillation or
 cardioversion, and drug therapy procedures.
 (2)  "Direct supervision" means supervision of an
 emergency medical technician-paramedic or licensed paramedic by a
 licensed physician who is present in the same area or an area
 adjacent to the area where an emergency medical
 technician-paramedic or licensed paramedic performs a procedure
 and who is immediately available to provide assistance and
 direction during the performance of the procedure.
 (b)  Notwithstanding other law, a person who is certified
 under this chapter as an emergency medical technician-paramedic or
 a licensed paramedic, is acting under the delegation and direct
 supervision of a licensed physician, and is authorized to provide
 advanced life support by a health care facility may in accordance
 with department rules provide advanced life support in the
 facility's emergency or urgent care clinical setting, including a
 hospital emergency room and a freestanding emergency medical care
 facility.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt any rules necessary to implement
 Section 773.0496, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *